Senate
|
08/23/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Joint Rules 61 and 62 suspended. (Page 5566.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2017
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 3. Page 962.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2017
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|