|
07/10/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 41, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
07/10/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2343.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1611.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 647.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|