Senate | 07/13/2017 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2017 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1300.) | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2017 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 960.) | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2017 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 14). | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2017 | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2017 | Read first time. To print. |