|
01/12/2018
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
01/03/2018
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2017
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/26/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/15/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3521.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/15/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2934.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1816.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2017
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2017
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|