|
07/25/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 135, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
07/25/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/18/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/17/2017
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 22. Page 2588.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/17/2017
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 19. Page 2585.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/17/2017
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/17/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2017
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 2074.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2017
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2012.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2085.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2017
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2017
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|