|
02/05/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 2, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2018
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3924.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after February 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2018
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3237.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2018
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1487.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|