Assembly | 03/20/2017 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2017 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2017 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2017 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2017 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2017 | Read first time. To print. |