California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB411 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2017

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2017

Amended

Bill July 6, 2017
Bill June 20, 2017
Bill April 20, 2017
Bill March 8, 2017