|
07/31/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 137, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
07/31/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/21/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/17/2017
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2071.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1711.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2017
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|