|
10/13/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 736, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/20/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3330.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2765.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 1930.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1486.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/19/2017
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/06/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/05/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|