|
09/11/2017
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2017
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
07/24/2017
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2465.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1842.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1143.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|