|
01/12/2018
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
01/03/2018
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/15/2017
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 23. Page 3390.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2848.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 19. Page 1950.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/19/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/06/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/05/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|