|
08/20/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 158, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6132.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5034.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1389.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|