Assembly | 02/01/2018 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2018 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2017 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2017 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2017 | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2017 | Read first time. To print. |