California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB480 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 12, 2017

Amended

Bill September 1, 2017
Bill June 20, 2017
Bill May 2, 2017
Bill March 30, 2017