Assembly | 02/01/2018 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2018 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2017 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2017 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2017 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2017 | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2017 | Read first time. To print. |