|
10/06/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 526, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/06/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/25/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 3365.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2017
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2757.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2017
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2017
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|