California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB490 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 6, 2017

Amended

Bill June 27, 2017
Bill May 26, 2017
Bill April 6, 2017
Bill March 20, 2017