|
09/01/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 194, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 2673.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1940.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1939.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
Motion to reconsider made by Senator Lara.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1937.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 961.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|