|
10/15/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 841, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/15/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3423.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2911.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1819.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2017
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|