|
09/27/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 314, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 2919.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 2. Page 2330.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1617.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2017
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|