Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 4. Page 1983.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2017
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|