|
09/25/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 272, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2333.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1820.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2017
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|