Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1422.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2017
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|