California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB530 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2017

Amended

Bill July 3, 2017
Bill June 19, 2017
Bill April 4, 2017