|
07/24/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 124, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
07/24/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2017
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1932.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1491.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|