California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB549 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2017

Enrolled

Bill July 19, 2017

Chaptered

Bill July 31, 2017

Amended

Bill June 13, 2017
Bill June 1, 2017
Bill April 17, 2017