California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB556 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2017

Amended

Bill August 29, 2017
Bill July 5, 2017
Bill June 20, 2017
Bill May 16, 2017
Bill April 24, 2017
Bill March 14, 2017