California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB565 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2018

Amended

Bill August 24, 2018
Bill June 28, 2018
Bill June 18, 2018
Bill April 20, 2017