Senate | 09/01/2017 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 07/10/2017 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2017 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2017 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2017 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1821.) | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2017 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26). | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2017 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2017 | Read first time. To print. |