|
09/28/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 344, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2922.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 2344.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1822.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|