California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB589 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2017

Amended

Bill September 8, 2017
Bill September 6, 2017
Bill July 12, 2017
Bill May 26, 2017
Bill April 27, 2017
Bill March 23, 2017