California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB602 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2017

Enrolled

Bill July 19, 2017

Chaptered

Bill July 31, 2017

Amended

Bill June 13, 2017
Bill May 26, 2017
Bill March 28, 2017