|
10/12/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 706, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 17. Page 3396.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2822.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 16. Page 1958.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2017
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|