California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB604 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 12, 2017

Amended

Bill September 8, 2017
Bill September 1, 2017
Bill June 20, 2017