Assembly | 02/01/2018 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2018 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2017 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2017 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2017 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2017 | Referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and A. & A.R. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2017 | Read first time. To print. |