California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB638 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2017

Amended

Bill August 24, 2018
Bill August 21, 2017
Bill July 18, 2017
Bill June 26, 2017
Bill June 22, 2017
Bill May 30, 2017
Bill April 24, 2017
Bill March 23, 2017