09/11/2017 | Stricken from file. | |||
08/21/2017 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |||
07/21/2017 | Vetoed by Governor. | |||
Assembly | 07/12/2017 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2017 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2017 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1842.). | ||
Senate | 06/27/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/26/2017 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2017 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1391.) | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2017 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26). | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2017 | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2017 | Read first time. To print. |