California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB659 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2017

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2017

Amended

Bill June 26, 2017
Bill March 21, 2017