Assembly
|
02/01/2018
|
Died on inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Bloom.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Reconsideration granted. (Page 2088.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Bloom.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 33. Noes 37. Page 2087.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 6.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|