California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB664 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2017

Enrolled

Bill August 10, 2018

Amended

Bill June 12, 2018
Bill January 11, 2018
Bill January 3, 2018
Bill April 18, 2017