|
10/03/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 445, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2907.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1488.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|