Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 19. Page 1913.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|