California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB669 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2017

Amended

Bill July 19, 2017
Bill June 26, 2017