|
10/08/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 582, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/20/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2759.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 1917.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|