|
07/24/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 126, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
07/24/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2017
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 1938.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 1645.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1540.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|