Assembly | 02/01/2018 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2018 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2017 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2017 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2017 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2017 | Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and G.O. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2017 | Read first time. To print. |