California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB679 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2017

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2017

Chaptered

Bill September 1, 2017

Amended

Bill June 8, 2017
Bill April 17, 2017