California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB693 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 14, 2017

Amended

Bill July 13, 2017
Bill June 12, 2017
Bill June 8, 2017
Bill March 28, 2017
Bill March 15, 2017