California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB707 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 15, 2017

Amended

Bill July 3, 2017
Bill June 29, 2017
Bill May 26, 2017
Bill April 24, 2017
Bill April 3, 2017